THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:22:58 PM
Kamara, Hawa
CPSO#:
87630
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Phone: (905) 845-8884
Fax: 905 844 5537
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAWA KAMARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMARA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 04 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2010 |