THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:32:38 PM
Yousuf, Junaid Abdul Hameed
CPSO#:
87612
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Program
Windsor Regional Hospital
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUNAID ABDUL HAMEED YOUSUF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSUF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |