THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:14:28 PM
Bakhshi Kahnamouei, Manijeh
CPSO#:
87594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Azari, English, Farsi
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 412
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON M2K 2W1
Phone: (647) 748-7887
Fax: (647) 748-7848
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANIJEH BAKHSHI KAHNAMOUEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKHSHI KAHNAMOUEI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 7, 2020. Dr. Bakhshi Kahnamouei has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)