THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:45:45 AM
Gebhardt, Colin Robert
CPSO#:
87549
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Mar 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2015 |