THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:55:47 AM
Wong, Helen Hoi Lam
CPSO#:
87520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-3281
Fax: (905) 721-6606
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HELEN HOI LAM WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2007 to 03 Sep 2007
EL - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2007 to 21 Dec 2007
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2010 |