THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:56:03 PM
Ugwumba, Rukevwe
CPSO#:
87518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Benin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3869 Jane St
Intrepid Health Jane & Finch
Toronto ON M3N 2K1
Phone: 647-776-1990
Fax: 416-754-4340
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria
Saskatchewan
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUKEVWE UGWUMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UGWUMBA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2007 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: September 25, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Rukevwe Ugwumba was charged with the following offences:
1. Fraud over $5,000, between January 1, 2016 and June 30, 2019, contrary to section 380(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Theft over $5,000, between January 1, 2016 and June 30, 2019, contrary to section 334(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Identity Theft, between January 1, 2016 and June 30, 2019, contrary to section 402.2(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4. Criminal Breach of Trust, between January 1, 2016 and June 30, 2019, contrary to section 336 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: September 25, 2023
Place of Charge: Regina, Saskatchewan
Regina Police Service