THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:49:49 AM
Redpath, Calum Jon
CPSO#:
87517
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7000
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:27 Jan 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2007 to 29 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2016 |
|
Active |