THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:24:40 AM
Azzam, Khalid Mohammad
CPSO#:
87499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Rajasthan University, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 45149
Fax: 905-381-7032
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Aug 2002 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHALID MOHAMMAD AZZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZZAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2023 |