THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:10:30 PM
Burga Alvarado, Alfonso Christian
CPSO#:
87456
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Emergency Department
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALFONSO CHRISTIAN BURGA ALVARADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURGA ALVARADO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2007 to 08 Oct 2007
AVP - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2007 to 16 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2008 to 16 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2012 |