THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:46:46 AM
Pulickamalil, Jolly Manual
CPSO#:
87449
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Calicut University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 16 Jul 2007 to 07 Oct 2007
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 08 Oct 2007 to 15 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 16 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |