THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:35:22 PM
El Ganga, Fouad Mehemmed
CPSO#:
87416
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Zagreb, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 May 2010
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Trauma General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |