THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:14:00 PM
Bajaj, Girish
CPSO#:
87397
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Delhi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
18 Kensington Rd
Suite 105
Brampton ON L6T 4S5
Phone: (416) 642-6524
Fax: (905) 901-5454
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GIRISH BAJAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJAJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |