THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:30:55 AM
Tam, Diamond Yat Fai
CPSO#:
87388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
70-50 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 3C2
Phone: 905-896-9979
Fax: 905-566-1897
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:20 Jul 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2013 |
|
Active |