THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:42:37 PM
Roche-Nagle, Michael Graham
CPSO#:
87355
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Eaton Wing North 6th Floor
Room 218
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5332
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:10 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
|
Active |