THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:09:16 AM
Viguera Salazar, Milagro Caridad
CPSO#:
87270
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Apr 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Apr 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Inst.Sup.Ciencias de Med.de Stgo.de Cuba, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
268 Main Street
Lucan Medical Centre
Lucan ON N0M 2J0
Phone: 519-227-1163
Fax: 519-227-1558
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MILAGRO CARIDAD VIGUERA SALAZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIGUERA SALAZAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2011 |