THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:36:41 AM
Wan, Jonathan Fung
CPSO#:
87269
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wan, Jonathan Fung Hiu (used until: 09 Jan 2013 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Fung Wan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 16 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN FUNG WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2013 |