THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:16:07 AM
Weind Matthews, Kirsten Lisa
CPSO#:
87215
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
586 Eglinton Ave E
RRI Imaging
Toronto ON M4P 1P2
Phone: (416) 485-9471
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN LISA WEIND MATTHEWS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIND MATTHEWS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2014 |