THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:31:03 AM
Dumitrescu, Corina Teodora
CPSO#:
87209
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 May 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Corina T. Dumitrescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 May 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2009 to 15 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |