THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:17:07 AM
Caycedo Marulanda, Antonio Jose
CPSO#:
87208
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad El Bosque, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Antonio Caycedo-Marulanda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 19 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |