THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:26:56 PM
O'Reilly, Elaine Michele
CPSO#:
87199
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montebello Medical Centre
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555
Fax: (905) 685-6558
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELAINE MICHELE O'REILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'REILLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2008 |