THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 2:46:47 AM
Alnassar, Mu'taz Morshed Abdallah
CPSO#:
87135
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jordan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:12 Dec 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2019 |
|
Active |