THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:38:02 AM
Perron, Lygia Beatriz Carvalho
CPSO#:
87105
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
12 Feb 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Oct 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2016 to 12 Feb 2017
EL - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Feb 2017 |