THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:56:34 AM
Jeffery, Andrew Herbert
CPSO#:
87098
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
12 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Jeffery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Sep 2014 |