THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:58:59 AM
Marin Arellano, Alejandra Ines
CPSO#:
87052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East Wellington Family Health Team
Unit A
PO Box 340
175 Alma Street
Rockwood ON N0B 2K0
Phone: 5198564681
Fax: 5198564612
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEJANDRA INES MARIN ARELLANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARIN ARELLANO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2009 |