THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:48:08 AM
Cattran, Meeka Lee
CPSO#:
87018
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
MacMillan, Meeka Lee (used until: 08 Nov 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson St.
Ottawa, ON
K1N 1C7
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 789-8450
Fax: (613) 789-8710
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MEEKA LEE CATTRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CATTRAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |