THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:15:49 AM
Francu, Corina Maria
CPSO#:
86991
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian
Education: Universitatea Transilvania, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6 - 314 Central Park Drive
Ottawa ON K2C 0R2
Phone: (613) 728-0608
Fax: (613) 728-4286
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CORINA MARIA FRANCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 11 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 12 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2014 |