THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:16:30 AM
Morin, Heather Ann
CPSO#:
86971
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-945-1502
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANN MORIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 07 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Jan 2009 to 07 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |