THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 18:02:50 PM
Hallock, Abhirami
CPSO#:
86956
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: McMaster University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Oncology
Walker Family Cancer Center
1200 4th Street
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:28 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABHIRAMI HALLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALLOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |