THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:07:33 AM
Tsui, Simon Yee Tuen
CPSO#:
86934
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tsui, Yee Tuen (used until: 27 Oct 2008 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10-78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIMON YEE TUEN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Jul 2008 to 02 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2009 |