THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:08:35 AM
Mascan, Lavinia Maria
CPSO#:
86931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Yorkdale Medical
Unit A 103
11685 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4E 0K7
Phone: (905) 770-9057
Fax: (905) 917-0215
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Feb 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAVINIA MARIA MASCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASCAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2010 |