THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:38:54 AM
Hendy, Ramez Hendy Mikhail
CPSO#:
86886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 930-4502
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Dec 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMEZ HENDY MIKHAIL HENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2011 to 14 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |