THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:15:05 AM
Swartzentruber, Shannon Clark
CPSO#:
86859
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Community Health Ctre
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 754-0777
Fax: (519) 754-0757
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANNON CLARK SWARTZENTRUBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWARTZENTRUBER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |