THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:35:02 AM
Bayanati, Hamid -
CPSO#:
86854
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
Module S
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73249
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HAMID - BAYANATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYANATI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2015 |