THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:11:57 AM
Sharda, Saroo
CPSO#:
86852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member - CPSO Staff as of
07 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sharma, Saroo (used until: 29 Apr 2013 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Leicester, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Department of Anesthesia
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville
Oakville ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 8452571 Ext. 3581
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAROO SHARDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARDA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2012 |