THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:13:21 PM
Roth Albin, Karina Vanessa
CPSO#:
86842
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of the Republic, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 402
614 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3E8
Phone: (519) 624-9583
Fax: (519) 624-6825
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: April 24, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On April 24, 2023, Cambridge Memorial Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 (1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Karina Vanessa Roth Albin had resigned her hospital privileges effective April 24, 2023. At the time of her resignation, the hospital was investigating a case involving Dr. Roth Albin.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARINA VANESSA ROTH ALBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH ALBIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |