THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:30:21 PM
Chang, Annisa
CPSO#:
86829
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7130 Warden Ave. Suite 207
Markham ON L3R 1S2
Phone: (905) 470-1117
Fax: (905) 470-1115
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Mar 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNISA CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2010 |