THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:22:31 AM
Chan, Crystal
CPSO#:
86828
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501-379 Church St
Markham Fertility Centre
Markham ON L6B 0T1
Phone: 289-800-5442
Fax: 289-800-5442
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CRYSTAL CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |