THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:14:48 AM
DA Samy, Santhi Prema Priya
CPSO#:
86817
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 May 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Malay, Tamil
Education: Universiti Sains Malaysia, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
438,Park Ave W
Chatham ON N7M 1X2
Phone: (519) 354-1200
Fax: (519) 354-1208
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Malaysia
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham Public General Hospital Society |
Chatham |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Sydenham District Hospital |
Wallaceburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANTHI PREMA PRIYA DA SAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DA SAMY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2009 |