THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:15:54 AM
Fung, Irene Ngar Yee
CPSO#:
86810
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
605 Royal York Road
Etobicoke ON M8Y 4G5
Phone: (416) 800-6500
Fax: (416) 342-1790
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:20 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRENE NGAR YEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2013 |