THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:54:42 PM
Greenwald, Joseph Aryeh
CPSO#:
86773
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Fax: (905) 527-1941
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:13 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH ARYEH GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2010 to 13 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2012 |