THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:04:11 AM
Daneshvar, Parham
CPSO#:
86759
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARHAM DANESHVAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANESHVAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2020 |