THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:36:54 AM
Hirji, Alim Shamash Bhanji
CPSO#:
86751
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alim Hirji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:36 Silbury Drive, Toronto, ON M1V 2P3
Date Received: 15 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:02 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 26 Jun 2012
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2015 |