THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:34:21 PM
Kathirgamanathan, Kalaimakal
CPSO#:
86740
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Hadwen Rd
Mississauga ON L5K2L3
Phone: 9058551860
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KALAIMAKAL KATHIRGAMANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATHIRGAMANATHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jun 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2014 to 21 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Aug 2016
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2012 |