THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:17:26 AM
Bonert, Michael
CPSO#:
86709
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Pathology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL BONERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2015 |