THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:04:57 AM
Backstein, Richard Manuel
CPSO#:
86705
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Centre For Minor Surgery
5109 Steeles Ave. W.
Suite 300
Toronto ON M9L 2Y8
Phone: 416-663-9649
Fax: 416-663-7407
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD MANUEL BACKSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BACKSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2013 |