THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:13:37 AM
Zeller, Michelle Paula
CPSO#:
86700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
H S C 3H54
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73928
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE PAULA ZELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Transfusion Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Transfusion Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2012 |