THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:19:13 AM
Ghazan-Shahi, Sassan
CPSO#:
86669
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ghazanshahi, Sassan (used until: 05 Jul 2012 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:31 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SASSAN GHAZAN-SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZAN-SHAHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 02 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 03 Aug 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 05 May 2009 to 03 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 04 Nov 2009 to 03 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 04 Nov 2010 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 04 Nov 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2012 |