THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:04:49 PM
Wray, Rebecca Susanne
CPSO#:
86630
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5420
Fax: (844) 282-8549
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA SUSANNE WRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2010 |