THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:11:01 AM
Chackungal, Smita
CPSO#:
86589
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
P.O Box 1800
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121 Ext. 2269
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SMITA CHACKUNGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKUNGAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2012 to 30 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 04 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Aug 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 2013 |