THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:40:32 PM
Costescu, Dustin James Whitby
CPSO#:
86495
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Non-Binary
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
H S C Room 2F 45
1200 Main Street
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76248
Fax: (905) 577-0471
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:11 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DUSTIN JAMES WHITBY COSTESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTESCU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 12 Sep 2011 to 11 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 12 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Aug 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2012 |